Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/25/2025
25CVI00021
Dayton Municipal

Rekia Mahmoud
Mobelini Home & Lawn LLC
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision


Docket History

4/25/2025
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/5/2025
Small Claims Hearing

2/19/2025
Small Claims Hearing

2/5/2025
Small Claims Hearing

1/29/2025
Motion For Extension Of Time

1/3/2025
Small Claims